Cum se calculeaza cum fac calculu: a) 100 000-856×12-95×23=?
b)75 680+197×48-608×13=?
C)853×(10 000-9 962)+240×56=?
D) 68×(48×59-43×56+176×9=?
E)(2950-96×24)+(123×35-299)-(516-67×6)=?
Va rog cum fac calculu multumesc

1
G) 3000-(184×7+59×8+345×9-462)×28

Răspunsuri

2014-11-19T13:16:24+02:00
A) 100 000-856×12-95×23= 100 000-10272-2185=89728-2185=87543
b)75 680+197×48-7904=75 680+9456-7904=85136-7904=77232

C)853×(10 000-9 962)+240×56=
853×38+240×56= 32414+13440=45854

D) 68×(48×59-43×56+176×9)=
68×(2832-2408+1584)=68x2008=136544

E)
(2950-96×24)+(123×35-299)-(516-67×6)=(2950-2304)+(4305-299)-(516-402)=(2950-2304)+(4305-299)-(516-402)=646+4006-114=4538


G) 3000-(184×7+59×8+345×9-462)×28=3000-(1288+472+3105-462)×28=3000-4403x28=3000-123284=-120284