Răspunsuri

2014-11-18T18:12:57+02:00
B) 12 x 24+2362-11x11 =288+2362-121=2650-121=2529

c) 2 305-22x14+1059 =2305-308+1059=1997+1059=3056

d)30x30+41x12-14x11=900+492-154=1392-154=1238