Răspunsuri

2014-10-28T13:19:29+02:00
399 × 68 = 27132
402 × 63 = 25326
872 × 96 = 83712
125 × 59 = 7375
726 × 85 = 61710
1 5 1
2014-10-28T13:19:54+02:00
399x68=27132
402x63=25326
872x96=83712
125x59=7375
726x85=61710