Răspunsuri

2014-10-14T08:31:14+03:00
129*130=16770 220*129=28380 350*99=34650 16770+28380-34650=45150-34650=10500
am mai postat 2 exercitii
ma poti ajuta?
mersi mult
??
si aici vreau rezolvarea,mersi
2014-10-14T08:40:05+03:00
129*130=13700
220*129=28380
350*99=34650
13700+28380-34650=7430