Răspunsuri

2014-10-13T15:31:44+03:00
A) 22(511+489)=22x1000=22000
b) 13(12-2+90)=13x100=1300
c) 377(67+33)=377x100=37700
2014-10-13T15:35:12+03:00
A) 22*(511+489)=22*1000=22 000
b) 13 *(12 -2+90)= 13*100 = 1300
c) nu inteleg ce reprezinta punctul, e virgula sau desparte miile de restul