Răspunsuri

2014-10-06T21:03:24+03:00
t=60x25-[190x5-(4x35+27x14):7]x37:74
(4x35+27x14)=140+378=518
[190x5-518:7]=950-74=876
deci t=1500-876x37:74=1300-32412:74=1300-438=862
Sper ca te-am ajutat , Daca consideri ca da te rog da-mi cel mai bun raspuns am nevoie , mersi


2014-10-06T21:05:37+03:00
60x25-[190x5-140+378:7]x37:74=
=1500-950-74x0,5=
=350-37=
T=313