Răspunsuri

2014-09-25T20:05:14+03:00
145+47*[215*110-83*(405-18*16)]=
145+47*[215*110-83*(405-288)]=
145+47*(23650-83*117)=
145+47*(23650-9711)=
145+47*13939=
145+655133=
=655278