Răspunsuri

2014-08-06T10:23:34+03:00

a . 13* ( 5+21+40)= 13 *66 = 858

b. 437* ( 109-54+203 ) =437*258 = 112746

1 5 1
2014-08-06T10:27:18+03:00
a)
13*5+13*21+13*40 = 13(5 + 21 + 40) = 13 * 46 =  598

b)
437*109-437*54+437*203 = 437(109 - 54 + 203) = 437 * 258 = 
112746